AR SB198 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB198 is now Act 1400
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Education - Division Of Public School Academic Facilities And Transportation Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Education - Division Of Public School Academic Facilities And Transportation Appropriation For The 2013-2014 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB198 is now Act 1400
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-18SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-18SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-18HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2013-04-18HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-18HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-18HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2013-04-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-04-17HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-17SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-17SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-17SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-17SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-17SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-04-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-08SenateRe-referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-04-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-08SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-08SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-04-08SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-01-30SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-01-30SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback