AR SB195 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; And To Amend The Definition Of “public Records”.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; And To Amend The Definition Of “public Records”.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2021-02-24SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-02-24SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-24SenateAmendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-24SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
2021-02-10SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-02-10SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-10SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-10SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2021-02-09SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-02-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-09SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-09SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2021-02-01SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-02-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-01SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-01SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-01-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-01-25SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback