AR SB192 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB192 is now Act 1135
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB192 is now Act 1135
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 26 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Taxation.
Title
To Make Technical Corrections To Title 26 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB192 is now Act 1135 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed |