AR SB185 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Notification that SB185 is now Act 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Appointment Procedure For The Tax Appeals Commission To Provide For The Filling Of Vacancies On The Commission; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Appointment Procedure For The Tax Appeals Commission To Provide For The Filling Of Vacancies On The Commission; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24SenateNotification that SB185 is now Act 346
2023-03-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-03-16SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-03-16SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-03-16SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-16SenateRules suspended.
2023-03-16SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2023-03-16SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-03-15SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2023-03-09SenateRe-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2023-03-09SenateReturned From the House as passed, as amended # 1
2023-03-09HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2023-03-09HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-03-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2023-02-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2023-02-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-02-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-02-16SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-02-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-01-31SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2023-01-31SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=sb185&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB185.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB185%2FSB185030820230939.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=346.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB185-H1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FSB185-DFA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAssembly%2F2023%2F2023R%2FFiscal+Impacts%2FSB185-DFA2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB185&rcs=216&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB185&rcs=476&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB185&rcs=543&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback