AR SB184 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that SB184 is now Act 1049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that SB184 is now Act 1049
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Modify The Method Used To Set The Teacher Deferred Retirement Option Plan Interest Rate; To Allow Balance Transfers Between Reciprocal Systems; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
An Act To Modify The Method Used To Set The Teacher Deferred Retirement Option Plan Interest Rate; To Allow Balance Transfers Between Reciprocal Systems; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Notification that SB184 is now Act 1049 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-30 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2017-03-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed |