AR SB183 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB183 is now Act 987
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit Certain Registered Sex Offenders From Holding A Position Of Public Trust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit Certain Registered Sex Offenders From Holding A Position Of Public Trust.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB183 is now Act 987
2019-04-10SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-10SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-09SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-09SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-08SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-04-05SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-05SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-05HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-07HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-07SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback