AR SB183 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-8)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Notification that SB183 is now Act 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-8)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Notification that SB183 is now Act 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create Procedures For Oversight Of Fossil-fuel-fired Electric Generating Units; To Regulate Carbon Dioxide Emissions; And To Create Procedures For Approval Of The State Plan By The Legislative Council.
Title
To Create Procedures For Oversight Of Fossil-fuel-fired Electric Generating Units; To Regulate Carbon Dioxide Emissions; And To Create Procedures For Approval Of The State Plan By The Legislative Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Notification that SB183 is now Act 382 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2015-03-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-02-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed |