AR SB182 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Notification that SB182 is now Act 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Notification that SB182 is now Act 364
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Regulate The Eligibility Of Certain Retirees To Participate In The State And Public School Life And Health Insurance Program.
Title
To Regulate The Eligibility Of Certain Retirees To Participate In The State And Public School Life And Health Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Senate | Notification that SB182 is now Act 364 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-04 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2015-02-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-02-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed |