AR SB179 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Certain Terms Of Office And The Reorganization Of Municipal Government.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Certain Terms Of Office And The Reorganization Of Municipal Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended. (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended. (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2019-04-10 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-04-10 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-04-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed |