AR SB172 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that SB172 is now Act 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Laws Regarding Social Work Licensing; To Clarify The Licensing Exemption For Students; And To Change The Term "reciprocity" To "endorsement".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Laws Regarding Social Work Licensing; To Clarify The Licensing Exemption For Students; And To Change The Term "reciprocity" To "endorsement".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateNotification that SB172 is now Act 623
2019-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-28SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-27SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-19HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-14SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-14SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-14SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-01-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback