AR SB170 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notification that SB170 is now Act 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notification that SB170 is now Act 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning County And Municipal Regulation Of Residential Building Design Elements.
Title
Concerning County And Municipal Regulation Of Residential Building Design Elements.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Notification that SB170 is now Act 446 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2019-02-26 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 3 |
2019-02-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |