AR SB17 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Reduce The Fees For A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun; And To Reduce The Fee To Renew A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Reduce The Fees For A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun; And To Reduce The Fee To Renew A License To Carry A Concealed Handgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Postpone - Failed to Pass (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-02-04SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-04SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-04SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-02-04HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-02-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-01-31HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-30HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-30HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-01-30SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-01-30SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-01-30SenateMotion to Postpone - Failed to Pass
2019-01-29SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-28SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-28SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-01-28SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2018-12-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback