AR SB165 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that SB165 is now Act 155
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that SB165 is now Act 155
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Termination And Cancellation Of A Residential Lease Under The Arkansas Soldiers' And Airmen's Civil Relief Act.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Termination And Cancellation Of A Residential Lease Under The Arkansas Soldiers' And Airmen's Civil Relief Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Notification that SB165 is now Act 155 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-23 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-02-09 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Filed |