AR SB163 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Notification that SB163 is now Act 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Petition Requirements To Form A New Political Party; To Require Signatures Of Three Percent (3%) Of The Total Votes Cast In The Most Recent Gubernatorial Election; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Petition Requirements To Form A New Political Party; To Require Signatures Of Three Percent (3%) Of The Total Votes Cast In The Most Recent Gubernatorial Election; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateNotification that SB163 is now Act 164
2019-02-14SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-02-14SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-13SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-13SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-02-13HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-02-13HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-02-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-30HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-01-30HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-01-30SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-01-30SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-01-30SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-01-29SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-24SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-01-24SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback