AR SB160 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-10-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Notification that SB160 is now Act 611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require Holocaust Education Be Taught In All Public Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require Holocaust Education Be Taught In All Public Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateNotification that SB160 is now Act 611
2021-04-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-06SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-06HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-29HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-29HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-29SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-29SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-18SenateAmendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
2021-02-04SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-04SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2021-01-26SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Education
2021-01-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-26SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-01-26SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2021-01-21SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-21SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-21SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-01-21SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-01-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-20SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb160&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB160/SB160012020211251.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB160/SB160012120211034.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB160/SB160012620211006.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB160/SB160020420210928.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB160/SB160031820210922.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=611.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB160-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB160-S2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB160-S3.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB160-S4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB160&rcs=2460&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB160&rcs=2689&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback