AR SB160 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Notification that SB160 is now Act 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Notification that SB160 is now Act 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal The Nonprofit Incentive Act Of 2005.
Title
To Repeal The Nonprofit Incentive Act Of 2005.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Notification that SB160 is now Act 208 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-17 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2017-02-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Filed |