AR SB159 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB159 is now Act 1259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB159 is now Act 1259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Permit A County Employee Who Works In The Courthouse And Who Is Also A Concealed Carry Licensee To Carry A Concealed Handgun In A County Courthouse.
Title
To Permit A County Employee Who Works In The Courthouse And Who Is Also A Concealed Carry Licensee To Carry A Concealed Handgun In A County Courthouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Notification that SB159 is now Act 1259 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-24 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed |