AR SB156 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Notification that SB156 is now Act 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Forming Open And Robust University Minds (forum) Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Forming Open And Robust University Minds (forum) Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateNotification that SB156 is now Act 184
2019-02-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-02-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-14SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-14SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-02-14HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-02-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-11HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-11SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-11SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-07SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-06SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2019-02-05SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-05SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-05SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-02-04SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback