AR SB155 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB155 is now Act 837
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish Lila's Law; And To Prohibit Discrimination Against Individuals With Disabilities Regarding Access To Organ Transplantation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish Lila's Law; And To Prohibit Discrimination Against Individuals With Disabilities Regarding Access To Organ Transplantation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateNotification that SB155 is now Act 837
2021-04-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-20SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-19SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-19SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2021-03-09SenateReturned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1.
2021-03-09HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-03-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-03-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-02-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-02-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-02-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-02-03SenateRules suspended.
2021-02-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-03SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-01-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-01-21SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-21SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-01-21SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-01-21SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-01-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb155&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB155/SB155011920211413.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB155/SB155012120211054.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB155/SB155020320210930.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB155/SB155030820211149.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=837.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB155-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB155-S2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB155-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB155&rcs=1871&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB155&rcs=2277&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB155&rcs=2845&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback