AR SB154 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Notification that SB154 is now Act 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Notification that SB154 is now Act 201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Qualifications And Duties Of The Executive Secretary Of The Board Of Trustees Of The Arkansas State Highway Employees' Retirement System.
Title
To Amend The Qualifications And Duties Of The Executive Secretary Of The Board Of Trustees Of The Arkansas State Highway Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Sample [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Notification that SB154 is now Act 201 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-15 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2017-02-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Filed |