AR SB152 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB152 is now Act 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Membership Of The Arkansas State Medical Board; And To Amend The Supervision And Prescriptive Authority Of Physician Assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Membership Of The Arkansas State Medical Board; And To Amend The Supervision And Prescriptive Authority Of Physician Assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateNotification that SB152 is now Act 634
2021-04-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-06SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-06HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-17SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-17SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-16SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2021-02-23SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-23SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-02-23SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-02-23SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-01-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb152&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB152/SB152011920211311.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB152/SB152022320211017.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB152/SB152031720211319.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=634.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB152-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB152-S2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB152&rcs=2384&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB152&rcs=2695&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback