AR SB151 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Notification that SB151 is now Act 181
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Pursuit Of A National Cancer Institute-designated Cancer Center At The Winthrop P. Rockefeller Cancer Institute At The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Pursuit Of A National Cancer Institute-designated Cancer Center At The Winthrop P. Rockefeller Cancer Institute At The University Of Arkansas For Medical Sciences.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenateNotification that SB151 is now Act 181
2019-02-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-02-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-14SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-14SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-02-14HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-02-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-05SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-04SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-31SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-30SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-23SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback