AR SB151 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Notification that SB151 is now Act 153
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Notification that SB151 is now Act 153
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise The Usage Fee For Branches Of An Arkansas Bank Located Out Of State; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Revise The Usage Fee For Branches Of An Arkansas Bank Located Out Of State; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Notification that SB151 is now Act 153 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-02-22 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-22 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2013-02-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Filed |