AR SB145 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Notification that SB145 is now Act 464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Certain Definitions Under The Arkansas Renewable Energy Development Act Of 2001; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Authority Of The Arkansas Public Service Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Certain Definitions Under The Arkansas Renewable Energy Development Act Of 2001; And To Amend The Law Concerning The Authority Of The Arkansas Public Service Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateNotification that SB145 is now Act 464
2019-03-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-13SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-12SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-12SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-12HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-12HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
2019-03-06HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-06SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-04SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-03-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-04SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-04SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-02-18SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-02-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-18SenateRules suspended.
2019-01-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-01-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback