AR SB140 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Require School District Boards Of Directors To Include In Student Discipline Policies The Requirement That Schools Conduct An Assessment Of A Student's Adverse Childhood Experiences Before Disciplining A Student.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require School District Boards Of Directors To Include In Student Discipline Policies The Requirement That Schools Conduct An Assessment Of A Student's Adverse Childhood Experiences Before Disciplining A Student.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 40 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseCLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2021-04-19HouseRead the third time and failed.
2021-04-19HouseMotion to reconsider SB 140 passed
2021-04-15HouseRead the third time and failed.
2021-04-15HouseMotion for immediate consideration passed
2021-04-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-05SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-23SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-23SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-23SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-23SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2021-03-16SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-16SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-16SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-16SenateAmendment #1 withdrawn
2021-03-16SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2021-01-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb140&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB140/SB140011920210951.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB140/SB140031620210937.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB140/SB140032320211123.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB140-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB140-S2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB140-S3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB140&rcs=2598&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB140&rcs=2888&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB140&rcs=2950&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback