AR SB138 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-19 - Notification that SB138 is now Act 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-19 - Notification that SB138 is now Act 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Annexation And Enclaves.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Annexation And Enclaves.
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Files [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | Notification that SB138 is now Act 109 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-13 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-13 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-09 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Filed |