AR SB135 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Notification that SB135 is now Act 128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Notification that SB135 is now Act 128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Act To Remove Obsolete References To "arkansas Works" In Title 6 Of The Arkansas Code.
Title
Act To Remove Obsolete References To "arkansas Works" In Title 6 Of The Arkansas Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Senate | Notification that SB135 is now Act 128 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-01-31 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-01-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed |