AR SB133 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Notification that SB133 is now Act 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Notification that SB133 is now Act 279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Property And Casualty Law; To Clarify The Depreciation Applicable When Determining The Value Of Damaged Property.
Title
To Amend The Property And Casualty Law; To Clarify The Depreciation Applicable When Determining The Value Of Damaged Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 39 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 39 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Notification that SB133 is now Act 279 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-24 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-24 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-24 | House | Motion to reconsider SB133 Passed. |
2017-02-23 | House | Rep. Dotson, J served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which SB133 Failed to Pass - 02/23/2017 01:58:59 PM |
2017-02-22 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-02-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-01-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed |