AR SB133 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Notification that SB133 is now Act 887
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Encourage The Use Of Telemedicine; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Encourage The Use Of Telemedicine; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-02SenateNotification that SB133 is now Act 887
2015-03-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-03-26SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-03-25SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-03-25SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-03-25HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2015-03-25HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-03-16HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-16SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-12SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-12SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-12SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2015-03-03SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2015-03-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-03SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2015-01-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2015-01-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback