AR SB131 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that SB131 is now Act 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that SB131 is now Act 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Exempt From The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 Certain Records Of The State Capitol Police.
Title
To Exempt From The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 Certain Records Of The State Capitol Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Notification that SB131 is now Act 474 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-07 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The vote by which the emergency clause FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed |