AR SB130 | 2010 | 87th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Status: Vetoed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Summary
An Act For The Secretary Of State - State Board Of Apportionment Appropriation For The 2010-2011 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Secretary Of State - State Board Of Apportionment Appropriation For The 2010-2011 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Returned to the Senate having been Vetoed by the Governor | |
2010-02-25 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2010-02-25 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2010-02-25 | House Returned To Senate as Passed. | |
2010-02-25 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2010-02-25 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2010-02-25 | House Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | House RULES SUSPENDED | |
2010-02-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2010-02-24 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2009/2010F/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB130 |