AR SB125 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Notification that SB125 is now Act 152
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide Incentives For Converting Diesel-powered Motor Vehicles And Gasoline-powered Motor Vehicles To Motor Vehicles Powered By Compressed Natural Gas Or Propane Gas; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide Incentives For Converting Diesel-powered Motor Vehicles And Gasoline-powered Motor Vehicles To Motor Vehicles Powered By Compressed Natural Gas Or Propane Gas; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenateNotification that SB125 is now Act 152
2013-02-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-02-20SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-02-20SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-02-20SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-02-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-02-20SenateRules suspended.
2013-02-20SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2013-02-20SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-02-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2013-02-11SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development
2013-02-11SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2013-02-11HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2013-02-11HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-02-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-02-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-02-07HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-02-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-02-06HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2013-01-31HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-01-31SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-01-31SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-01-31SenateORDERED ENGROSSED
2013-01-31SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-01-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-01-31SenateImmediate Consideration
2013-01-31SenateRules suspended.
2013-01-31SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted.
2013-01-31SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-01-31SenateRules suspended.
2013-01-29SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-01-24SenateFiled
2013-01-24SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback