AR SB123 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that SB123 is now Act 314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Update The Drug Screening And Testing Act Of 2015; And To Make The Two-year Pilot Program A Permanent Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Update The Drug Screening And Testing Act Of 2015; And To Make The Two-year Pilot Program A Permanent Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-02SenateNotification that SB123 is now Act 314
2017-02-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-02-23SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-02-22SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-02-22SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2017-02-22HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-02-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-13HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-02-13SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-02-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-09SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-07SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-02-07SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-07SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-07SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2017-01-23SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-23SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-23SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-23SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2017-01-19SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-19SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-01-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback