AR SB121 | 2016 | 90th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Notification that SB121 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Notification that SB121 is now Act 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2016-2017 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Notification that SB121 is now Act 3 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Motion to reconsider failed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Returned to the Senate from the Governor's Office with line-item veto |
2016-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2016-04-21 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2016-04-21 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2016-04-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2016-04-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Filed |