AR SB119 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Role Of The Department Of Career Education With Respect To Riverside Vocational And Technical School.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Role Of The Department Of Career Education With Respect To Riverside Vocational And Technical School.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-25SenateDied in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn by author.
2019-01-23SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-16SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback