AR SB1150 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1150 is now Act 1434
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Laws Concerning Distribution Of Spirituous And Vinous Liquor In The State Of Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Laws Concerning Distribution Of Spirituous And Vinous Liquor In The State Of Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB1150 is now Act 1434
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-19HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2013-04-10HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-10SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-08SenateEXPUNGED
2013-04-08SenateRead third time and failed to pass.
2013-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback