AR SB115 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide Exceptions To The Minimum Wage Law; To Amend The Law Impacting Initiated Act 5 Of 2018; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide Exceptions To The Minimum Wage Law; To Amend The Law Impacting Initiated Act 5 Of 2018; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-25SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-03-13SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-13SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-13SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-13SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2019-03-06SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-06SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-06SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-01-24SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-24SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-24SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-01-24SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-16SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback