AR SB115 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Notification that SB115 is now Act 86
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Notification that SB115 is now Act 86
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Exclude Funds Distributable From A Trust Account Established By A State-supported Retirement System From The Unclaimed Property Act.
Title
To Exclude Funds Distributable From A Trust Account Established By A State-supported Retirement System From The Unclaimed Property Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Notification that SB115 is now Act 86 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Returned from the House as Passed |
2013-02-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2013-02-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed |