AR SB1147 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that SB1147 is now Act 1329
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that SB1147 is now Act 1329
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Evaluate The Impact Of School Discipline On Student Achievement.
Title
To Evaluate The Impact Of School Discipline On Student Achievement.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Chesterfield [D] | Sen. Frederick Love [D] | Rep. John Catlett [D] | Sen. Joyce Elliott [D] |
Sen. Johnny Key [R] | Rep. Sheilla Lampkin [D] | Rep. James McLean [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Notification that SB1147 is now Act 1329 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-04-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |