AR SB114 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Notification that SB114 is now Act 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Appointment Of City Treasurer In A City Of The Second Class And An Incorporated Town.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Appointment Of City Treasurer In A City Of The Second Class And An Incorporated Town.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateNotification that SB114 is now Act 234
2019-02-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-02-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-02-26SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-02-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-26SenateRules suspended.
2019-02-26SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-02-19SenateReturned from the House as passed, as amended #1
2019-02-19HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-02-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-31HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-01-31SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-01-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-01-30SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-01-30SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-01-29SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-01-24SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-01-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-01-16SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback