AR SB108 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB108 is now Act 769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB108 is now Act 769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Health - Licensing And Regulation Boards Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Health - Licensing And Regulation Boards Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Notification that SB108 is now Act 769 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2021-04-15 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2021-04-15 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-04-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-03-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Filed |