AR SB108 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB108 is now Act 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Notification that SB108 is now Act 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal Arkansas Code § 10-3-1002 Concerning An Annual Evaluation Of Vocational-technical Courses By The Legislative Council, The House Committee On Education, And The Senate Committee On Education.
Title
To Repeal Arkansas Code § 10-3-1002 Concerning An Annual Evaluation Of Vocational-technical Courses By The Legislative Council, The House Committee On Education, And The Senate Committee On Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Notification that SB108 is now Act 337 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2019-02-04 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 2 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-29 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-01-24 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed |