AR SB1060 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Protect The Insured Drivers Of Arkansas; And To Encourage Compliance With The Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Laws Of Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Protect The Insured Drivers Of Arkansas; And To Encourage Compliance With The Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Laws Of Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 42 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateSine Die adjournment
2013-05-17HouseReturned to the Senate.
2013-05-17HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-04-08HouseRead the third time and failed.
2013-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2013-03-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-26SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
2013-03-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-26SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-26SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback