AR SB106 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Notification that SB106 is now Act 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Notification that SB106 is now Act 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Award Of A Service Weapon Upon The Retirement Or Death Of An Employee Of The Department Of Correction To The Employee's Surviving Child.
Title
Concerning The Award Of A Service Weapon Upon The Retirement Or Death Of An Employee Of The Department Of Correction To The Employee's Surviving Child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Notification that SB106 is now Act 106 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-02-11 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-02-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-01-30 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Filed |