AR SB1050 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1050 is now Act 1422
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Code Concerning The Advisory Committee On Public School Academic Facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Code Concerning The Advisory Committee On Public School Academic Facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB1050 is now Act 1422
2013-04-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-17SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-17SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-17HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-05SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback