AR SB1033 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB1033 is now Act 1179
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB1033 is now Act 1179
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Renting Or Leasing Of Property Within The State Capitol Building, The Capitol Hill Building, And Adjacent Parking Areas.
Title
Concerning The Renting Or Leasing Of Property Within The State Capitol Building, The Capitol Hill Building, And Adjacent Parking Areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | Senate | Notification that SB1033 is now Act 1179 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |