AR SB1029 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Ensure That Candidates For Office Are Qualified; To Require Criminal Background Checks For Candidates Before The Election; And To Prevent Candidates Convicted Of Certain Crimes From Running For Public Office.
Title
To Ensure That Candidates For Office Are Qualified; To Require Criminal Background Checks For Candidates Before The Election; And To Prevent Candidates Convicted Of Certain Crimes From Running For Public Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2013-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-26 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |