AR SB1020 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1020 is now Act 1497
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Health Care Independence Act Of 2013; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Health Care Independence Act Of 2013; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - The vote by which SB1020 Passed was expunged. (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB1020 is now Act 1497
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-18SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-18SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-18SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-18SenateHouse Amendment No. 3 and 4 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2013-04-18SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 and 4
2013-04-18SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-04-18SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2013-04-17HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 3 and 4.
2013-04-17HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-17HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-17HouseAmendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-17HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-17HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-17HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 and 4.
2013-04-17HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-17HouseThe vote by which SB1020 Passed was expunged.
2013-04-17HouseReturned From the Senate as requested.
2013-04-17SenateReturned To the House as requested.
2013-04-17SenateThe vote by which SB1020 passed on April 16 was expunged
2013-04-17SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2013-04-17SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-04-17Senatereturned from the Governor's office as requested
2013-04-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-17SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-16SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-16SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-16SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 and 2
2013-04-16SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-12SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-04-12SenateReturned from the House as Passed as Amended, Emergency Clause having Failed of Adoption
2013-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate as passed, as amended #1 and #2, with Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
2013-04-11HouseEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2013-04-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-10HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-10HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-10HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-10HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-10HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-09HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 and 2.
2013-04-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-05SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-05SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-02SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-04-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-02SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-02SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-04-02SenateRules suspended.
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB1020
Texthttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SB1020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=1615&votechamber=Senate
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=1627&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=1628&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=1909&votechamber=Senate
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=1887&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=1888&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=1889&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=1902&votechamber=House
Roll Callhttp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/Votes.aspx?rcsnum=2005&votechamber=Senate

Bill Comments

feedback