AR SB1013 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For Comprehensive Investigations Of Election Misconduct; To Create A Voter Integrity Unit Administered By The Secretary Of State; And To Allow The Voter Integrity Unit To Perform Recounts.
Title
To Provide For Comprehensive Investigations Of Election Misconduct; To Create A Voter Integrity Unit Administered By The Secretary Of State; And To Allow The Voter Integrity Unit To Perform Recounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 27 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2015-04-09 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2015-04-01 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-03-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |