AR SB1010 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1010 is now Act 1420
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Offense Of Unlawful Sale Of Bedding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Offense Of Unlawful Sale Of Bedding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB1010 is now Act 1420
2013-04-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-18SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-17SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-17SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-17HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-17HouseCLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2013-04-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-04-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-21SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-21SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-03-21SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2013-03-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2013-03-11SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback